Senate | 04/06/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |