Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1290 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1290


 AN ACT
 relating to authorization for school districts to provide mentors
 for teachers assigned to a new subject or grade level.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 21.458, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Each school district may assign a mentor teacher to each
 classroom teacher who has less than two years of teaching
 experience in the subject or grade level to which the teacher is
 assigned. A teacher assigned as a mentor must:
 (1) to the extent practicable, teach in the same
 school;
 (2) to the extent practicable, teach the same subject
 or grade level, as applicable; and
 (3) meet the qualifications prescribed by
 commissioner rules adopted under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1290 passed the Senate on
 April 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1290 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor