E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5977
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3461
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1243
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/26/09 7:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 4880
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4880
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1269
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1108
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|