1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1328 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to a study on the feasibility of providing vaccines to |
---|
6 | 6 | | first responders deployed to a disaster area. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this Act: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (1) "Department" means the Department of State Health |
---|
10 | 10 | | Services. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (2) "Disaster" means: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (A) a public health disaster as defined by |
---|
13 | 13 | | Section 81.003, Health and Safety Code; |
---|
14 | 14 | | (B) a natural or man-made disaster; |
---|
15 | 15 | | (C) a terrorist attack; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (D) a hostile military or paramilitary action; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (E) an extraordinary law enforcement emergency; |
---|
18 | 18 | | or |
---|
19 | 19 | | (F) any other state of disaster declared under |
---|
20 | 20 | | Chapter 418, Government Code. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (3) "First responder" has the meaning assigned by |
---|
22 | 22 | | Section 421.095, Government Code. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The department shall conduct a study to determine the |
---|
24 | 24 | | feasibility of providing vaccines to: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) a first responder who may be exposed to |
---|
26 | 26 | | vaccine-preventable diseases during the responder's deployment to |
---|
27 | 27 | | a disaster area; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) the immediate family members of a first responder |
---|
29 | 29 | | to whom the first responder may transmit a vaccine-preventable |
---|
30 | 30 | | disease after deployment to a disaster area. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) The study must consider the feasibility of providing the |
---|
32 | 32 | | following vaccines: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) the hepatitis B vaccine for first responders who |
---|
34 | 34 | | may be in direct contact with blood and other bodily fluids; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) a tetanus-containing vaccine; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) other vaccines or biologicals recommended by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for disasters. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d) The department shall: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) assess the vaccination status of first responders |
---|
40 | 40 | | and their immediate family members in this state; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) assess workplace immunization policies and |
---|
42 | 42 | | insurance coverage for first responders; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (3) make recommendations on educating first |
---|
44 | 44 | | responders and their immediate family members about available |
---|
45 | 45 | | options to obtain immunization services, regardless of insurance |
---|
46 | 46 | | coverage; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (4) assess the current ability of the department, in |
---|
48 | 48 | | conjunction with local health departments, to provide vaccines to |
---|
49 | 49 | | first responders and their immediate family members who are |
---|
50 | 50 | | uninsured or underinsured; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (5) identify and recommend funding sources for the |
---|
52 | 52 | | procurement of recommended vaccines for first responders and their |
---|
53 | 53 | | immediate family members who are uninsured or underinsured; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | (6) evaluate the potential use and cost of providing |
---|
55 | 55 | | other biologicals, such as immune globulin, to be used in |
---|
56 | 56 | | conjunction with vaccines to prevent the spread of |
---|
57 | 57 | | vaccine-preventable diseases. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (e) The statewide wellness coordinator designated under |
---|
59 | 59 | | Subsection (a), Section 664.053, Government Code, shall assist the |
---|
60 | 60 | | department in obtaining data from state agencies that employ first |
---|
61 | 61 | | responders by: |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) consulting with the wellness liaison identified |
---|
63 | 63 | | under Subsection (d), Section 664.053, Government Code, for a state |
---|
64 | 64 | | agency that employs first responders to gain study-related |
---|
65 | 65 | | information from the state agency; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) assessing the readiness of each state agency to |
---|
67 | 67 | | administer vaccines to the agency's first responders before |
---|
68 | 68 | | deployment to a disaster area; and |
---|
69 | 69 | | (3) providing to the department appropriate |
---|
70 | 70 | | information from state agencies regarding the current immunization |
---|
71 | 71 | | policies of those agencies. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (f) A state agency that provides data to the department for |
---|
73 | 73 | | purposes of the study shall ensure that the data does not identify a |
---|
74 | 74 | | first responder or family member of a first responder to whom the |
---|
75 | 75 | | data pertains. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (g) Not later than August 1, 2011, the department shall |
---|
77 | 77 | | submit to the legislature a written report containing the findings |
---|
78 | 78 | | of the study and the department's recommendations. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (h) This section expires September 1, 2011. |
---|
80 | 80 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
81 | 81 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
82 | 82 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
83 | 83 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
84 | 84 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
87 | 87 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1328 passed the Senate on |
---|
88 | 88 | | April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
89 | 89 | | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
91 | 91 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1328 passed the House on |
---|
92 | 92 | | May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, one |
---|
93 | 93 | | present not voting. |
---|
94 | 94 | | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | 95 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
96 | 96 | | Approved: |
---|
97 | 97 | | ______________________________ |
---|
98 | 98 | | Date |
---|
99 | 99 | | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | 100 | | Governor |
---|