House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|