Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1343 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1343


 AN ACT
 relating to the formula funding for public institutions of higher
 education for certain credit hours that do not count toward a
 degree.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 61.0595, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (d) The following are not counted for purposes of
 determining whether the student has previously earned the number of
 semester credit hours specified by Subsection (a):
 (1) semester credit hours earned by the student before
 receiving an associate or [a] baccalaureate degree that has
 previously been awarded to the student;
 (2) semester credit hours earned by the student by
 examination or under any other procedure by which credit is earned
 without registering for a course for which tuition is charged;
 (3) credit for a remedial education course, a
 technical course, a workforce education course funded according to
 contact hours, a dual credit course for which the student received
 credit toward a high school diploma, or another course that does not
 count toward a degree program at the institution; and
 (4) semester credit hours earned by the student at a
 private institution or an out-of-state institution.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 61.0595, Education Code, applies beginning with the funding
 recommendations made under Section 61.059, Education Code, for the
 2011-2012 academic year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1343 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1343 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor