Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to s/c by chair | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |