House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3110 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2134 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Carona | Journal Page: 1678 |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |