E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5977
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3461
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4884
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1244
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|