Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1369 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1369
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the appointment of attorneys ad litem and to
66 court-appointed volunteer advocates in certain suits affecting the
77 parent-child relationship.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 74.092, Government Code, is amended to
1010 read as follows:
1111 Sec. 74.092. DUTIES OF LOCAL ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE. (a) A
1212 local administrative judge, for the courts for which the judge
1313 serves as local administrative judge, shall:
1414 (1) implement and execute the local rules of
1515 administration, including the assignment, docketing, transfer, and
1616 hearing of cases;
1717 (2) appoint any special or standing committees
1818 necessary or desirable for court management and administration;
1919 (3) promulgate local rules of administration if the
2020 other judges do not act by a majority vote;
2121 (4) recommend to the regional presiding judge any
2222 needs for assignment from outside the county to dispose of court
2323 caseloads;
2424 (5) supervise the expeditious movement of court
2525 caseloads, subject to local, regional, and state rules of
2626 administration;
2727 (6) provide the supreme court and the office of court
2828 administration requested statistical and management information;
2929 (7) set the hours and places for holding court in the
3030 county;
3131 (8) supervise the employment and performance of
3232 nonjudicial personnel;
3333 (9) supervise the budget and fiscal matters of the
3434 local courts, subject to local rules of administration;
3535 (10) coordinate and cooperate with any other local
3636 administrative judge in the district in the assignment of cases in
3737 the courts' concurrent jurisdiction for the efficient operation of
3838 the court system and the effective administration of justice; [and]
3939 (11) establish and maintain a list of all attorneys
4040 qualified to serve as an attorney ad litem; and
4141 (12) perform other duties as may be directed by the
4242 chief justice or a regional presiding judge.
4343 (b) A list of attorneys ad litem maintained under Subsection
4444 (a)(11) must contain the names of all attorneys who:
4545 (1) meet any statutory or other requirements to serve
4646 as an attorney ad litem; and
4747 (2) have registered to serve as attorney ad litem with
4848 a court for which the judge maintaining the list serves as local
4949 administrative judge.
5050 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 74, Government Code, is
5151 amended by adding Section 74.098 to read as follows:
5252 Sec. 74.098. APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEYS AD LITEM; MAINTENANCE
5353 OF LIST. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), in each case in
5454 which the appointment of an attorney ad litem is necessary, a court
5555 shall appoint the attorney whose name appears first on the list of
5656 attorneys ad litem maintained by the local administrative judge for
5757 that court as required by Section 74.092.
5858 (b) The court may appoint an attorney included on the list
5959 whose name does not appear first on the list or an attorney not
6060 included on the list if the appointment of that attorney as attorney
6161 ad litem is:
6262 (1) required on a complex matter because the attorney
6363 possesses relevant specialized education, training, certification,
6464 or skill;
6565 (2) made pursuant to the Family Code, Health and
6666 Safety Code, Human Resources Code, Texas Trust Code (Subtitle B,
6767 Title 9, Property Code), or Texas Probate Code; or
6868 (3) agreed on by the parties and approved by the court.
6969 (c) After an attorney has been appointed as an attorney ad
7070 litem from the list, the local administrative judge shall place
7171 that attorney's name at the end of the list.
7272 SECTION 3. Subdivision (2), Section 264.601, Family Code,
7373 is amended to read as follows:
7474 (2) "Volunteer advocate program" means a
7575 volunteer-based, nonprofit program that:
7676 (A) provides advocacy services to abused or
7777 neglected children with the goal of obtaining a permanent placement
7878 for a child that is in the child's best interest; and
7979 (B) complies with recognized standards for
8080 volunteer advocate programs.
8181 SECTION 4. Section 264.602, Family Code, is amended by
8282 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
8383 follows:
8484 (a) The statewide organization with which the attorney
8585 general contracts under Section 264.603 shall contract for services
8686 with eligible volunteer advocate programs to provide advocacy
8787 services to abused or neglected children [expand the existing
8888 services of the programs].
8989 (f) Expenses incurred by a volunteer advocate program to
9090 promote public awareness of the need for volunteer advocates or to
9191 explain the work performed by volunteer advocates that are paid
9292 with money from the attorney general volunteer advocate program
9393 account under Section 504.611, Transportation Code, are not
9494 considered administrative expenses for the purpose of Section
9595 264.603(b).
9696 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 264.603, Family Code, is
9797 amended to read as follows:
9898 (a) The attorney general shall contract with one statewide
9999 organization of individuals or groups of individuals who have
100100 expertise in the dynamics of child abuse and neglect and experience
101101 in operating volunteer advocate programs to provide training,
102102 technical assistance, and evaluation services for the benefit of
103103 local volunteer advocate programs. The contract shall:
104104 (1) include [require] measurable goals and objectives
105105 relating to the number of:
106106 (A) volunteer advocates in the program; and
107107 (B) children receiving services from the
108108 program; and
109109 (2) follow practices designed to ensure compliance
110110 with standards referenced in the contract [for expanding local
111111 volunteer child advocate programs to areas of the state in which
112112 those programs do not exist].
113113 SECTION 6. Subsection (a), Section 264.604, Family Code, is
114114 amended to read as follows:
115115 (a) A person is eligible for a contract under Section
116116 264.602 only if the person is a public or private nonprofit entity
117117 that operates a volunteer advocate program that:
118118 (1) uses individuals appointed as volunteer advocates
119119 or guardians ad litem by the court to provide for the needs of
120120 abused or neglected children;
121121 (2) has provided court-appointed advocacy services
122122 for at least six months [two years];
123123 (3) provides court-appointed advocacy services for at
124124 least 10 children each month; and
125125 (4) has demonstrated that the program has local
126126 judicial support.
127127 SECTION 7. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 264.607, Family
128128 Code, are repealed.
129129 SECTION 8. Not later than December 1, 2009, each local
130130 administrative judge shall establish a list of attorneys registered
131131 and qualified to serve as attorney ad litem in a court for which the
132132 judge serves as local administrative judge as required by Section
133133 74.092, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
134134 SECTION 9. The change in law made by this Act applies only
135135 to the appointment of an attorney ad litem on or after December 1,
136136 2009.
137137 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
138138 ______________________________ ______________________________
139139 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
140140 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1369 passed the Senate on
141141 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
142142 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
143143 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
144144 ______________________________
145145 Secretary of the Senate
146146 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1369 passed the House, with
147147 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
148148 Nays 3, one present not voting.
149149 ______________________________
150150 Chief Clerk of the House
151151 Approved:
152152 ______________________________
153153 Date
154154 ______________________________
155155 Governor