Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1371 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1371


 AN ACT
 relating to the colonia self-help program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 15.951, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (2) and adding Subdivisions (2-a) and (2-b) to
 read as follows:
 (2) "Colonia" means a geographic area that:
 (A) is an economically distressed area as defined
 by Section 17.921;
 (B) is located in a county any part of which is
 within 50 miles of an international border; and
 (C) consists of at least 11 [or more] dwellings,
 or of at least a lower number of dwellings as specified by the board
 for which the board determines that a self-help project will be
 cost-effective, that are located in close proximity to each other
 in an area that may be described as a community or neighborhood.
 (2-a)  "Nonprofit organization" means an organization
 qualifying for an exemption from federal income taxes under Section
 501(c)(3), Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 (2-b)  "Political subdivision" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 17.921.
 SECTION 2. Section 15.953, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 15.953. USE OF ACCOUNT. (a) The board may use funds
 in the account to reimburse a political subdivision or a nonprofit
 organization for eligible [only to reimburse nonprofit
 organizations eligible under Section 15.954 for] expenses incurred
 in a self-help project that results in the provision of adequate
 water or wastewater services to a colonia. Eligible expenses under
 this subsection [Expenses that may be reimbursed] include:
 (1) construction expenses;
 (2) facility planning expenses;
 (3) platting expenses;
 (4) surveying expenses;
 (5) engineering expenses;
 (6) equipment expenses; and
 (7) other expenses necessary to provide water or
 wastewater services to the colonia, as determined appropriate by
 the board.
 (b) The board may award a grant under the program directly
 to a political subdivision or nonprofit organization to reimburse
 the subdivision or organization for expenses incurred in a
 self-help project described by Subsection (a). If the board
 determines that a retail public utility described by Section
 15.955(8) has made a commitment to the self-help project sufficient
 to ensure that retail water or wastewater service will be extended
 to the colonia, the board may make an advance of grant funds. An
 advance under this subsection is subject to the terms determined by
 the board and may not exceed 10 percent of the total amount of the
 grant.
 SECTION 3. Section 15.954, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 15.954. ELIGIBLE POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS AND NONPROFIT
 ORGANIZATIONS. To be eligible to receive a grant under the
 program, a political subdivision or a nonprofit [an] organization
 must:
 (1) demonstrate work experience relevant to extending
 retail water or wastewater utility service to colonias in
 coordination with retail public utilities [apply for the grant];
 and
 (2) develop a plan that requires self-help project
 beneficiaries to actively participate in the implementation of the
 project, in coordination with a retail public utility described by
 Section 15.955(8) [qualify for an exemption from federal income
 taxes under Section 501(c)(3), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as
 amended; and
 [(3)     as of January 1, 2001, have a demonstrated record
 of completing in coordination with a retail public utility
 construction of self-help projects described by Section
 15.953(a)].
 SECTION 4. Section 15.955, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 15.955. GRANT APPLICATION. An eligible political
 subdivision or nonprofit organization must apply to the board for a
 grant under the program before incurring any expense associated
 with a self-help project described by Section 15.953(a). The
 application must include:
 (1) the name of the political subdivision or nonprofit
 organization, the names of the political subdivision's authorized
 representative or the nonprofit [the] organization's principal
 officers, and verification of the nonprofit [the] organization's
 501(c)(3) status;
 (2) a description of the project area, the anticipated
 number of water and wastewater connections to be made, and the
 anticipated number of colonia residents to be served;
 (3) a description of the existing water and wastewater
 facilities in the colonia;
 (4) a description of the project and the aspect of the
 project for which the grant will be used;
 (5) a description of the anticipated participation in
 the project by residents of the colonia;
 (6) the estimated total cost of both the project and
 the aspect of the project for which the grant will be used;
 (7) the amount of the grant that is requested from the
 account and the sources of funding for the entire project;
 (8) from a retail public utility authorized to provide
 water or wastewater services to the colonia, a resolution in which
 the retail public utility:
 (A) agrees to inspect the project during and
 after construction to ensure the adequacy of the project; and
 (B) commits to provide the water or wastewater
 services that the project intends to use; and
 (9) any other information required by the board.
 SECTION 5. Section 15.956, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 15.956. BOARD CONSIDERATIONS IN EVALUATING GRANT
 APPLICATION. In evaluating an application for a grant under the
 program, the board shall consider:
 (1) the number of colonia residents to be served by the
 self-help project;
 (2)  the capability of the political subdivision or
 nonprofit organization to complete the self-help project in a
 timely manner;
 (3) the[,] quality[, and character] of any projects
 previously completed by the applicant; and
 (4) [(2)] the commitment demonstrated by [capability
 of] the retail public utility to provide water or wastewater
 services to the colonia on completion of the project.
 SECTION 6. Section 15.959, Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1371 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1371 passed the House on
 May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 96, Nays 48, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor