E
|
05/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
E
|
05/11/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2197
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#561
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/4/09 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2117
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 879
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 837
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|