Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |