House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 894
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 894
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 894
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 894
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|