E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#942
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3650
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3650
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2669
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3259
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|