House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2452 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |