House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3110 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1218 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Shapiro | Journal Page: 958 |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |