Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1403 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1403


 AN ACT
 relating to changing the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool to the
 Texas Health Insurance Pool, and to the operation of that pool.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1506. TEXAS HEALTH INSURANCE [RISK] POOL
 SECTION 2. Subdivision (7), Section 1506.001, Insurance
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (7) "Pool" means the Texas Health Insurance [Risk]
 Pool.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1506.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1506.010.  REDESIGNATION.  Effective September 1, 2009,
 the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool is redesignated the Texas
 Health Insurance Pool. A reference in any law to the Texas Health
 Insurance Risk Pool means the Texas Health Insurance Pool.
 SECTION 4. Section 1506.152, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (f) to read
 as follows:
 (b) Subject to Subsection (f), each [Each] dependent of an
 individual who is eligible for coverage from the pool is also
 eligible for coverage from the pool.
 (c) Subject to Subsection (f), if [If] an individual who
 obtains coverage from the pool under Subsection (a) is a child, each
 parent, grandparent, brother, sister, or child of that individual
 who resides with that individual is also eligible for coverage from
 the pool.
 (f)  A dependent or individual described by Subsection (c)
 who is not a federally defined eligible individual and who has not
 experienced a significant break in coverage may not obtain coverage
 from the pool before the first date on which the dependent or
 individual has been:
 (1)  a legally domiciled resident of this state for at
 least the 30 days preceding the date of the application for coverage
 from the pool; and
 (2)  a citizen or permanent resident of the United
 States for at least three continuous years.
 SECTION 5. Section 1506.153, Insurance Code, as amended by
 Chapters 808 (S.B. 1254), 881 (H.B. 1977), and 1070 (H.B. 2548),
 Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted
 and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1506.153. INELIGIBILITY FOR COVERAGE. (a) Notwithstanding
 Section 1506.152 [Section 1506.152(a)-(c)], an individual is not
 eligible for coverage from the pool if:
 (1) on the date pool coverage is to take effect, the
 individual has health benefit plan coverage from a health benefit
 plan issuer or health benefit arrangement in effect, except as
 provided by Section 1506.152(a)(3)(E);
 (2) at the time the individual applies to the pool,
 except as provided in Subsection (b), the individual is eligible
 for other health care benefits, including an offer of benefits from
 the continuation of coverage under Title X, Consolidated Omnibus
 Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (29 U.S.C. Section 1161 et
 seq.)[, as amended] (COBRA), other than:
 (A) coverage, including COBRA or other
 continuation coverage or conversion coverage, maintained for any
 preexisting condition waiting period under a pool policy or during
 any preexisting condition waiting period or other waiting period of
 the other coverage;
 (B) employer group coverage conditioned by a
 limitation of the kind described by Section 1506.152(a)(3)(A) or
 (C); or
 (C) individual coverage conditioned by a
 limitation described by Section 1506.152(a)(3)(C) or (D);
 (3) within 12 months before the date the individual
 applies to the pool, the individual terminated coverage in the
 pool, unless the individual:
 (A) demonstrates a good faith reason for the
 termination; or
 (B) is a federally defined eligible individual;
 (4) the individual is confined in a county jail or
 imprisoned in a state or federal prison;
 (5) any of the individual's premiums are paid for or
 reimbursed under a government-sponsored program or by a government
 agency or health care provider;
 (6) the individual's prior coverage with the pool was
 terminated:
 (A) during the 12-month period preceding the date
 of application for nonpayment of premiums; or
 (B) for fraud; or
 (7) the individual is eligible for health benefit plan
 coverage provided in connection with a policy, plan, or program
 paid for or sponsored by an employer, even though the employer
 coverage is declined. This subdivision does not apply to an
 individual who is a part-time employee or a part-time employee's
 dependent eligible to participate in an employer plan that provides
 health benefit coverage:
 (A) that is more limited or restricted than
 coverage with the pool; and
 (B) for which there is no employer contribution
 to the premium, either directly or indirectly.
 (b) An individual eligible for benefits from the
 continuation of coverage under Title X, Consolidated Omnibus Budget
 Reconciliation Act of 1985 (29 U.S.C. Section 1161 et seq.)[, as
 amended] (COBRA), or a comparable federal or state employee
 coverage continuation program, who did not elect continuation of
 coverage during the election period, or whose elected continuation
 of coverage lapsed or was cancelled without reinstatement, is
 eligible for pool coverage. Eligibility under this subsection is
 subject to a minimum 180-day exclusion of coverage under Section
 1506.155(a-1).
 SECTION 6. Section 1506.155, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1) Except as provided by Section 1506.056, pool coverage
 for an individual eligible pursuant to Section 1506.153(b) excludes
 charges or expenses incurred before the first anniversary of [the
 expiration of 180 days from] the effective date of coverage with
 regard to any condition for which:
 (1) the existence of symptoms would cause an
 ordinarily prudent person to seek diagnosis, care, or treatment
 within the six-month period preceding the effective date of
 coverage; or
 (2) medical advice, care, or treatment was recommended
 or received during the six-month period preceding the effective
 date of coverage.
 (c-1)  If an individual eligible under Section 1506.153(b)
 was covered by creditable coverage at any time during the 12-month
 period immediately preceding the effective date of the individual's
 coverage under the pool, the pool shall subtract from the exclusion
 period required under Subsection (a-1) up to 180 days of:
 (1)   the period during which the individual was
 covered under the creditable coverage; and
 (2)  any waiting period that applied before the
 creditable coverage became effective.
 SECTION 7. Subsection (b), Section 1506.2523, Insurance
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) For purposes of this section, gross health benefit plan
 premiums do not include premiums collected for:
 (1) coverage under a Medicare supplement benefit plan
 subject to Chapter 1652;
 (2) coverage under a small employer health benefit
 plan subject to Subchapters A-H, Chapter 1501; or
 (3) coverage or insurance listed in Section
 1506.002(b), (c), or (d).
 SECTION 8. This Act applies only to an application for
 initial or renewal coverage through the Texas Health Insurance Risk
 Pool under Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act,
 that is filed with the pool on or after January 1, 2010. An
 application filed before that date is governed by the law in effect
 on the date on which the application was filed, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1403 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1403 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor