House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2134 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1728 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1302 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |