Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1419 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R9099 TJS-F
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1419


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to this state's goal for renewable energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (d), and (o) and adding Subsections (d-1)
 and (d-2) to read as follows:
 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a goal [target] of 10,000 megawatts of installed
 renewable capacity by January 1, 2020 [2025]. The cumulative
 installed renewable capacity in this state shall total [2,280
 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009,]
 4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1,
 2013, and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the renewable
 energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of
 this subsection by January 1, 2020 [after September 1, 2005], the
 commission shall establish a goal [target] of having at least 4,000
 [500] megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy technology
 other than a source that uses high-capacity [using] wind energy.
 The cumulative installed renewable capacity from a source other
 than high-capacity wind energy shall total 500 megawatts by January
 1, 2012, 2,000 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and 4,000 megawatts by
 January 1, 2020.
 (d) In this section, "renewable energy technology" means
 any technology that exclusively relies on an energy source that is
 naturally regenerated over a short time and derived directly from
 the sun, indirectly from the sun, or from moving water or other
 natural movements and mechanisms of the environment. Renewable
 energy technologies include those that rely on energy derived
 directly from the sun, on wind, geothermal, hydroelectric, wave, or
 tidal energy, or on renewable biomass or renewable biomass-based
 waste products, including landfill gas. A renewable energy
 technology does not rely on energy resources derived from fossil
 fuels, waste products from fossil fuels, or waste products from
 inorganic sources.
 (d-1) In this section, "renewable biomass" means:
 (1)  planted crops and crop residue harvested from
 agricultural land cleared before September 1, 2009, whether
 actively managed or fallow, excluding forest land;
 (2)  wood waste from actively managed tree plantations
 on nonfederal land cleared before September 1, 2009, including land
 that belongs to an Indian tribe and is held in trust by the United
 States or is otherwise subject to a restriction on alienation
 imposed by the United States;
 (3)  forest wood waste, including residual tops and
 limbs of trees, unused cull trees, pre-commercial thinnings, and
 wood or debris from noncommercial tree species, slash, or brush
 obtained from nonfederal forest land, including land that belongs
 to an Indian tribe and is held in trust by the United States or is
 otherwise subject to a restriction on alienation imposed by the
 United States, excluding old growth forests or ecologically
 sensitive areas;
 (4)  residential or commercial yard waste or food
 waste, including recycled cooking grease;
 (5)  organic matter from the vicinity of buildings,
 public infrastructure, or other areas regularly occupied by people;
 (6) animal waste and animal by-products; and
 (7) algae.
 (d-2)  In this section, "high-capacity wind energy" means
 energy from a source using wind that has a capacity of more than 150
 kilowatts.
 (o) The commission shall [may] establish an alternative
 compliance payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
 section. The commission shall [may] establish a separate
 alternative compliance payment for the goal of 4,000 [500]
 megawatts of capacity from renewable energy technologies other than
 high-capacity wind energy. [The alternative compliance payment for
 a renewable energy purchase requirement that could be satisfied
 with a renewable energy credit from wind energy may not be less than
 $2.50 per credit or greater than $20 per credit.    Prior to September
 1, 2009, an alternative compliance payment under this subsection
 may not be set above $5 per credit.    In implementing this
 subsection, the commission shall consider:
 [(1)     the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 [(2)     the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 [(3)     the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 [(4)     any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate
 increases.]
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.