House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3171 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2190 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2190 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Williams | Journal Page: 2188 |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2142 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |