House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1175 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1175 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1175 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Shapiro | Journal Page: 1174 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |