E | 05/20/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2618 | |
E | 05/12/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2308 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3207 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2308 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2199 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2012 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#532 | Journal Page: 2382 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Amended | 1-Pitts | Journal Page: 2382 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2331 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2331 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2235 | Journal Page: 2331 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |