1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1458 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the authority of certain taxing units to enter into an |
---|
6 | 6 | | ad valorem tax abatement agreement. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 312.006, Tax Code, as amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | Chapters 1029 (H.B. 1449) and 1505 (H.B. 1200), Acts of the 77th |
---|
10 | 10 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2001, is reenacted and amended to |
---|
11 | 11 | | read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 312.006. EXPIRATION DATE. If not continued in effect, |
---|
13 | 13 | | this chapter expires September 1, 2019 [2009]. |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended |
---|
15 | 15 | | by adding Section 312.007 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 312.007. DEFERRAL OF COMMENCEMENT OF ABATEMENT PERIOD. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) In this section, "abatement period" means the period during |
---|
18 | 18 | | which all or a portion of the value of real property or tangible |
---|
19 | 19 | | personal property that is the subject of a tax abatement agreement |
---|
20 | 20 | | is exempt from taxation. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, |
---|
22 | 22 | | the governing body of the taxing unit granting the abatement and the |
---|
23 | 23 | | owner of the property that is the subject of the agreement may agree |
---|
24 | 24 | | to defer the commencement of the abatement period until a date that |
---|
25 | 25 | | is subsequent to the date the agreement is entered into, except that |
---|
26 | 26 | | the duration of an abatement period may not exceed 10 years. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 3. Section 312.402, Tax Code, is amended by |
---|
28 | 28 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a-3) to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (a) The commissioners court may execute a tax abatement |
---|
31 | 31 | | agreement with the owner of taxable real property located in a |
---|
32 | 32 | | reinvestment zone designated under this subchapter or with the |
---|
33 | 33 | | owner of tangible personal property located on real property in a |
---|
34 | 34 | | reinvestment zone to exempt from taxation all or a portion of the |
---|
35 | 35 | | value of the real property, all or a portion of the value of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | tangible personal property located on the real property, or all or a |
---|
37 | 37 | | portion of the value of both[. The court may execute a tax |
---|
38 | 38 | | abatement agreement with the owner of a leasehold interest in |
---|
39 | 39 | | tax-exempt real property or leasehold interests or improvements on |
---|
40 | 40 | | tax-exempt real property that is located in a reinvestment zone |
---|
41 | 41 | | designated under this subchapter to exempt a portion of the value of |
---|
42 | 42 | | tangible personal property or leasehold interests or improvements |
---|
43 | 43 | | on tax-exempt real property located on the real property. The |
---|
44 | 44 | | execution, duration, and other terms of an agreement made under |
---|
45 | 45 | | this section are governed by the provisions of Sections 312.204, |
---|
46 | 46 | | 312.205, and 312.211 applicable to a municipality. Section |
---|
47 | 47 | | 312.2041 applies to an agreement made by a county under this section |
---|
48 | 48 | | in the same manner as it applies to an agreement made by a |
---|
49 | 49 | | municipality under Section 312.204 or 312.211]. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (a-1) The commissioners court may execute a tax abatement |
---|
51 | 51 | | agreement with the owner of a leasehold interest in tax-exempt real |
---|
52 | 52 | | property located in a reinvestment zone designated under this |
---|
53 | 53 | | subchapter to exempt all or a portion of the value of the leasehold |
---|
54 | 54 | | interest in the real property. The court may execute a tax |
---|
55 | 55 | | abatement agreement with the owner of tangible personal property or |
---|
56 | 56 | | an improvement located on tax-exempt real property that is located |
---|
57 | 57 | | in a designated reinvestment zone to exempt all or a portion of the |
---|
58 | 58 | | value of the tangible personal property or improvement located on |
---|
59 | 59 | | the real property. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (a-2) The execution, duration, and other terms of an |
---|
61 | 61 | | agreement entered into under this section are governed by the |
---|
62 | 62 | | provisions of Sections 312.204, 312.205, and 312.211 applicable to |
---|
63 | 63 | | a municipality. Section 312.2041 applies to an agreement entered |
---|
64 | 64 | | into under this section in the same manner as that section applies |
---|
65 | 65 | | to an agreement entered into under Section 312.204 or 312.211. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (a-3) The commissioners court may execute a tax abatement |
---|
67 | 67 | | agreement with a lessee of taxable real property located in a |
---|
68 | 68 | | reinvestment zone designated under this subchapter to exempt from |
---|
69 | 69 | | taxation all or a portion of the value of the fixtures, |
---|
70 | 70 | | improvements, or other real property owned by the lessee and |
---|
71 | 71 | | located on the property that is subject to the lease, all or a |
---|
72 | 72 | | portion of the value of tangible personal property owned by the |
---|
73 | 73 | | lessee and located on the real property that is the subject of the |
---|
74 | 74 | | lease, or all or a portion of the value of both the fixtures, |
---|
75 | 75 | | improvements, or other real property and the tangible personal |
---|
76 | 76 | | property described by this subsection. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 4. Section 312.007, Tax Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
78 | 78 | | is intended to clarify rather than change existing law. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 5. An ad valorem tax abatement agreement that was |
---|
80 | 80 | | executed before the effective date of this Act by the commissioners |
---|
81 | 81 | | court of a county and an owner of taxable real property or tangible |
---|
82 | 82 | | personal property or an owner of a leasehold interest in tax-exempt |
---|
83 | 83 | | real property, under Section 312.402, Tax Code, as that section |
---|
84 | 84 | | existed before the effective date of this Act, that provides for an |
---|
85 | 85 | | exemption from taxation of all or a portion of the value of real |
---|
86 | 86 | | property, tangible personal property, or both, or of all or a |
---|
87 | 87 | | portion of the value of a leasehold interest in tax-exempt real |
---|
88 | 88 | | property, that is not invalid for a reason other than an |
---|
89 | 89 | | inconsistency with Section 312.402, Tax Code, as that section |
---|
90 | 90 | | existed before the effective date of this Act, and that is |
---|
91 | 91 | | consistent with Section 312.402, Tax Code, as amended by this Act, |
---|
92 | 92 | | is ratified and validated as of the date the agreement was executed. |
---|
93 | 93 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
94 | 94 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
95 | 95 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
96 | 96 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
97 | 97 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
100 | 100 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1458 passed the Senate on |
---|
101 | 101 | | April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
102 | 102 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the |
---|
103 | 103 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
104 | 104 | | ______________________________ |
---|
105 | 105 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
106 | 106 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1458 passed the House, with |
---|
107 | 107 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
108 | 108 | | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
109 | 109 | | ______________________________ |
---|
110 | 110 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
111 | 111 | | Approved: |
---|
112 | 112 | | ______________________________ |
---|
113 | 113 | | Date |
---|
114 | 114 | | ______________________________ |
---|
115 | 115 | | Governor |
---|