House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1348 |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1347 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1347 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |