House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 899 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |