Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1479 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1479


 AN ACT
 relating to benefits payable under certain health coverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1425 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1425.  APPLICATION OF SUBTITLE TO CERTAIN COVERAGE
 Sec. 1425.001.  EXEMPTION FROM APPLICATION OF SUBTITLE.
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 1425.002, a provision of this
 subtitle that becomes effective on or after January 2, 2010, does
 not apply to:
 (1) a plan that provides coverage only:
 (A)  for a specified disease or diseases or under
 an individual limited benefit policy;
 (B) for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy; or
 (D) for dental or vision care;
 (2)  disability income insurance coverage or a
 combination of accident-only and disability income insurance
 coverage;
 (3) credit insurance coverage;
 (4) a hospital confinement indemnity policy;
 (5)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (6) a workers' compensation insurance policy;
 (7)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 a motor vehicle insurance policy;
 (8)  a long-term care insurance policy, including a
 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, except as provided by
 Subsection (b); or
 (9) an occupational accident policy.
 (b)  A long-term care insurance policy, including a nursing
 home fixed indemnity policy, is subject to this subtitle if the
 commissioner determines that the policy provides benefits so
 comprehensive that it is a health benefit plan and should not be
 subject to the exemption provided under this section.
 Sec. 1425.002.  SPECIFIC LANGUAGE CONTROLS.  A provision of
 this subtitle that becomes effective on or after January 2, 2010,
 and that requires coverage or the offer of coverage of a health care
 service or benefit applies to a plan or policy described by Section
 1425.001(a) only to the extent expressly and specifically provided
 by law.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1479 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1479 passed the House on
 May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor