E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR86
|
Journal Page: 6962
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 86
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5110
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 5109
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5109
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 5096
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|