House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2205 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |