E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6972
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 88
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5111
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5111
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1639
|
Journal Page: 6288
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6288
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4787
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2423
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#658
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Keffer and Farabee
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/7/09 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
4-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Aycock and Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3900
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|