House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|