E | 05/20/2009 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | April 1, 2011 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2618 | |
E | 05/12/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2308 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3207 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2221 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#720 | Journal Page: 3071 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3071 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3071 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2998 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2998 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2987 | Journal Page: 2998 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 2141 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Ordered not printed | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |