E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1565
|
Journal Page: 6070
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6070
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4425
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4425
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5469
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5469
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2638
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4114
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1005
|
Journal Page: 4113
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4113
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 4112
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4112
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4043
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4043
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|