House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1789 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1789 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1789 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1789 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA5 Hegar | Journal Page: 1789 |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 1788 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1785 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 4/30/09 11:00 AM | Journal Page: 1758 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Shapleigh | Journal Page: 1757 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |