Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1574 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1574
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that the county clerk of certain
 counties prepare a written records management and preservation
 services plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (e), Section 118.0216, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (e) [In a county that is adjacent to an international
 boundary, the county clerk shall prepare an annual written plan for
 funding the automation projects and records management and
 preservation services performed by the clerk. After a public
 hearing, the plan shall be considered for approval by the
 commissioners court. Funds from the records management and
 preservation account may be expended only as provided by the plan.]
 All expenditures from the records management and preservation
 account shall comply with Subchapter C, Chapter 262.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (e), Section 118.0216, Local Government Code, applies only to a
 requirement that a county clerk prepare an annual written plan on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A plan adopted before the
 effective date of this Act and expenditures under that plan are
 subject to the requirements of Subsection (e), Section 118.0216,
 Local Government Code, as that law existed on the date the plan was
 adopted, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *