E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4093 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4073 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3726 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3726 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3726 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3726 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3695 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3695 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB4115 | Journal Page: 3695 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1794 |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 577 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 577 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |