Senate | 05/04/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 578 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 578 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |