House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1218
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Averitt
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 954
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
01/29/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|