Senate | 05/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1940 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |