House
|
05/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|