Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1646 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1646


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Council on Children and Families.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter T to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER T. COUNCIL ON CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
 Sec. 531.801.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "council"
 means the Council on Children and Families.
 Sec. 531.802.  COUNCIL ON CHILDREN AND FAMILIES. (a)  The
 Council on Children and Families is established to:
 (1)  coordinate the state's health, education, and
 human services systems to ensure that children and families have
 access to needed services;
 (2)  improve coordination and efficiency in state
 agencies, advisory councils on issues affecting children, and local
 levels of service;
 (3)  prioritize and mobilize resources for children;
 and
 (4)  facilitate an integrated approach to providing
 services for children and youth.
 (b) The council shall:
 (1)  promote a common vision of desired outcomes for
 children and youth and of family and community supports;
 (2)  promote shared accountability for outcomes for
 children and youth; and
 (3)  align allocations of resources with policies for
 children and youth.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (d), the council is composed of
 the following:
 (1) the executive commissioner;
 (2) the commissioner of state health services;
 (3)  the commissioner of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services;
 (4) the commissioner of aging and disability services;
 (5)  the commissioner of assistive and rehabilitative
 services;
 (6) the commissioner of education;
 (7)  the executive director of the Texas Juvenile
 Probation Commission;
 (8)  the executive commissioner of the Texas Youth
 Commission;
 (9)  the executive director of the Texas Workforce
 Commission;
 (10)  the director of the Texas Correctional Office on
 Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments;
 (11)  two public representatives who are parents of
 children who have received services from an agency represented on
 the council, appointed by the executive commissioner; and
 (12)  two representatives who are young adults or
 adolescents who have received services from an agency represented
 on the council, appointed by the executive commissioner.
 (d)  An individual listed in Subsections (c)(1)-(10) may
 designate another individual as having authority to act on behalf
 of the individual at council meetings and with respect to council
 functions.
 (e)  The members of the council annually shall elect one
 member to serve as the presiding officer.
 (f)  Council meetings are held at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (g)  The council is administratively attached to the
 commission but is independent of direction by the commission or the
 executive commissioner. The commission, through the commission's
 Office of Program Coordination for Children and Youth, shall
 provide administrative support and resources to the council as
 necessary to enable the council to perform its duties.
 (h)  The agencies represented on the council shall provide
 periodic staff support of specialists as needed to the council.
 (i) The council is not subject to Chapter 2110.
 Sec. 531.803. DUTIES. (a) The council shall:
 (1)  analyze the biennial legislative appropriations
 requests of members of the council for services provided to
 children and their families and identify appropriations that,
 through the coordination of members of the council, could be
 modified in the next legislative appropriation request to eliminate
 waste or increase available services and, not later than May 1 of
 each even-numbered year, prepare a report recommending those
 modifications for consideration during the development of the next
 biennial legislative appropriations request;
 (2)  investigate opportunities to increase flexible
 funding for health, education, and human services provided to
 children and their families;
 (3)  identify methods to remove barriers to local
 coordination of health, education, and human services provided to
 children and their families;
 (4)  identify methods to ensure that children and youth
 receive appropriate assessment, diagnoses, and intervention
 services;
 (5)  develop methods to prevent unnecessary parental
 relinquishment of custody of children;
 (6)  prioritize assisting children in family settings
 rather than institutional settings; and
 (7)  make recommendations about family involvement in
 the provision and planning of health, education, and human services
 for a child, including family partner and liaison models.
 (b)  The state agency members of the council may, as
 appropriate, enter into memoranda of understanding with other
 agencies to implement any method, process, policy, or
 recommendation identified or developed under Subsection (a).
 Before a method, process, policy, or recommendation is implemented,
 the council shall:
 (1) identify:
 (A)  the timeline and proposed outcome of
 implementing the method, process, policy, or recommendation; and
 (B)  benchmarks that may be used to measure the
 success of the implementation of the method, process, policy, or
 recommendation; and
 (2)  assign to the appropriate members of the council
 responsibility for implementing the method, process, policy, or
 recommendation.
 (c)  The council may collect data necessary to conduct the
 council's duties or implement the council's recommendations and
 shall use any reports or information produced by other entities
 related to children, youth, and families to inform the council.
 Sec. 531.804.  REPORT BY COUNCIL REGARDING CHILD WELFARE.
 Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year, the council
 shall submit a report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker
 of the house of representatives, and members of the legislature
 that contains:
 (1)  the requests, plans, and recommendations of the
 council, including recommendations of any legislation that is
 needed to further develop and maintain a statewide system of
 quality health, education, and human services for children and
 families; and
 (2)  information regarding the implementation by the
 members of the council of any method, process, policy, or
 recommendation, including information regarding whether the
 implementation has proceeded in accordance with the timeline,
 outcome, and benchmarks identified by the council.
 Sec. 531.805.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Council on Children
 and Families is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is
 abolished and this subchapter expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2. The Council on Children and Families established
 by Section 531.802, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall
 convene its initial meeting not later than October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1646 passed the Senate on
 May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1646 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor