House
|
05/24/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|