Senate | 04/30/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |