House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 624
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 624
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|