Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1670 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1670
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
66 Department of Transportation to Polk County.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than September 30, 2009, the
99 Texas Department of Transportation shall transfer to Polk County
1010 the real property described by Subsection (f) of this section.
1111 (b) Polk County may use the property transferred under this
1212 Act only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the
1313 state. If Polk County uses the property for any purpose other than
1414 a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state, Polk
1515 County shall pay to the Texas Department of Transportation an
1616 amount equal to the fair market value of the property on the date
1717 Polk County begins using the property for the purpose other than a
1818 purpose that benefits the public interest of the state, less the
1919 amount that Polk County paid to the Texas Department of
2020 Transportation under Subsection (c) of this section.
2121 (c) On the effective date of the transfer authorized under
2222 Subsection (a) of this section, Polk County shall pay an amount to
2323 reimburse the Texas Department of Transportation for the
2424 department's actual costs to acquire the property. If the Texas
2525 Department of Transportation cannot determine that amount, the
2626 amount shall be determined based on the average historical
2727 right-of-way acquisition values for right-of-way located in
2828 proximity to the property described by Subsection (f) of this
2929 section on the date of original acquisition of the property by the
3030 Texas Department of Transportation. Money received by the Texas
3131 Department of Transportation under this subsection shall be
3232 deposited in the state highway fund and used in the Texas Department
3333 of Transportation district in which the property is located.
3434 (d) The Texas Department of Transportation shall transfer
3535 the property by an appropriate instrument of transfer. The
3636 instrument of transfer must:
3737 (1) provide that:
3838 (A) Polk County may use the property only for a
3939 purpose that benefits the public interest of the state; or
4040 (B) if Polk County uses the property for any
4141 purpose other than a purpose that benefits the public interest of
4242 the state, Polk County shall pay to the Texas Department of
4343 Transportation an amount equal to the fair market value of the
4444 property on the date Polk County begins using the property for the
4545 purpose other than a purpose that benefits the public interest of
4646 the state, less the amount that Polk County paid to the Texas
4747 Department of Transportation under Subsection (c) of this section;
4848 and
4949 (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes
5050 and bounds.
5151 (e) The Texas Department of Transportation shall retain
5252 custody of the instrument of transfer after the instrument of
5353 transfer is filed in the real property records of Polk County.
5454 (f) The real property referred to in this section is
5555 described as follows:
5656 FIELDNOTES of 10.549 Acres in the M.L. Choate Survey, A-15, Polk
5757 County, Texas and being all of a 1.338 Acre Tract described under
5858 Parcel 28, Part 1 in a Judgment of Court in the State of Texas, et
5959 al, versus Wayne Duncan and wife, Judy Duncan, dated August 6, 1975
6060 and recorded in Volume 305, Page 357 of the Polk County Deed Records
6161 and also being part of a 20.198 Acre Tract described under Parcel
6262 26, Part 2 in a deed from H.D. Nixon and wife, Bonibel Nixon, et al,
6363 to the State of Texas dated August 21, 1975 and recorded in Volume
6464 305, Page 726 of said Deed Records. Said 10.549 Acres being more
6565 particularly described as follows:
6666 BEGINNING at the most Northerly West corner of said 20.198 Acre
6767 Tract and an interior corner of a 224.204 Acre Tract conveyed to the
6868 City of Livingston by deed recorded in Volume 450, Page 805 of said
6969 Deed Records, found a concrete monument with a 1/2" iron rod for
7070 corner;
7171 THENCE with the most Northerly Northwest Line of said 20.198 Acre
7272 Tract and a Southeast Line of said 224.204 Acre Tract, N4828'33"E
7373 399.68 feet to the most Northerly North corner of said 20.198 Acre
7474 Tract and an interior corner of said 224.204 Acre Tract, found a
7575 concrete monument with a 1/2" iron rod for corner;
7676 THENCE with the most Northerly Northeast Line of said 20.198 Acre
7777 Tract, a Southwest Line of said 224.204 Acre Tract, the Southwest
7878 Line of Garden Ridge Subdivision as shown on a Plat recorded in
7979 Volume 11, Page 31 of the Polk County Plat Records, the Southwest
8080 Line of the residue of a 4.873 Acre Tract conveyed to Donald R.
8181 Langston by deed recorded in Volume 1064, Page 882 of said Official
8282 Records, and the Northeast Line of said 1.338 Acre Tract,
8383 S4133'29"E 1,149.91 feet to an interior corner of said 20.189 Acre
8484 Tract and the South corner of said residue Tract, found a concrete
8585 monument with a 1/2" iron rod for corner which bears N4126'31"W 200
8686 feet from Highway No. 59 centerline station 164+49.77 and also
8787 marks the beginning of a Control of Access Line;
8888 THENCE across and severing said 20.198 Acre Tract, S4833'29"W, at
8989 369.77 feet and N4126'31"W 200 feet from station 161+10.00 pass the
9090 end of said Control of Access Line and continue on same course a
9191 total distance of 399.77 feet to an interior corner of said 20.198
9292 Acre Tract and the East corner of a 1.250 Acre Tract conveyed to the
9393 Polk County Chamber of Commerce by deed recorded in Volume 1089,
9494 Page 79 of said Official Records, found a concrete monument with a
9595 1/2" iron rod for corner which bears N4126'31"W 200 feet from said
9696 Highway centerline at station 160+50.00;
9797 THENCE with the Northeast Line of said 1.250 Acre Tract, the
9898 Northeast Line of said 224.204 Acre Tract, and the Southwest Line of
9999 said 20.198 Acre Tract, N4133'13"W 1,149.34 feet to the Place of
100100 Beginning and containing 10.549 Acres of Land.
101101 The bearings described herein are based upon the most Westerly
102102 Northwest Line of said 20.198 Acre Tract.
103103 (g) Polk County shall pay any transaction fees resulting
104104 from the transfer of property under this Act.
105105 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
106106 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
107107 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
108108 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
109109 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
110110 ______________________________ ______________________________
111111 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
112112 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1670 passed the Senate on
113113 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
114114 ______________________________
115115 Secretary of the Senate
116116 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1670 passed the House on
117117 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one
118118 present not voting.
119119 ______________________________
120120 Chief Clerk of the House
121121 Approved:
122122 ______________________________
123123 Date
124124 ______________________________
125125 Governor