Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1699 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1699


 AN ACT
 relating to consistency among certain secretary of state filings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 9.525, Business &
 Commerce Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as otherwise provided in Subsections (b), (e),
 and (f), the fee for filing and indexing a record under this
 subchapter[, other than an initial financing statement of the kind
 described in Subsection (b),] is:
 (1) $15 if the record is communicated in writing and
 consists of one or two pages;
 (2) $30 if the record is communicated in writing and
 consists of more than two pages; and
 (3) $5 if the record is communicated by another medium
 authorized by filing-office rule.
 (b) Except as otherwise provided in Subsection (e), the fee
 for filing and indexing an initial financing statement of the
 following kinds is:
 (1) $60 if the financing statement indicates that it
 is filed in connection with a public-finance transaction; [and]
 (2) $60 if the financing statement indicates that it
 is filed in connection with a manufactured-home transaction; and
 (3) $60 if the debtor is a transmitting utility.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 9.526, Business &
 Commerce Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) To keep the filing-office rules and practices of the
 filing office in harmony with the rules and practices of filing
 offices in other jurisdictions that enact substantially this
 subchapter, and to keep the technology used by the filing office
 compatible with the technology used by filing offices in other
 jurisdictions that enact substantially this subchapter, the
 Secretary of State, so far as is consistent with the purposes,
 policies, and provisions of this chapter, in adopting, amending,
 and repealing filing-office rules, shall:
 (1) consult with filing offices in other jurisdictions
 that enact substantially this subchapter;
 (2) consult the most recent version of the Model
 Administrative Rules promulgated by the International Association
 of Commercial [Corporation] Administrators or any successor
 organization; and
 (3) take into consideration the rules and practices
 of, and the technology used by, filing offices in other
 jurisdictions that enact substantially this subchapter.
 SECTION 3. Section 9.527, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 9.527. DUTY TO REPORT. The Secretary of State shall
 report before January 1 of each odd-numbered year to the
 Legislature on the operation of the filing office. The report must
 contain a statement of the extent to which:
 (1) the filing-office rules are not in harmony with
 the rules of filing offices in other jurisdictions that enact
 substantially this subchapter and the reasons for these variations;
 and
 (2) the filing-office rules are not in harmony with
 the most recent version of the Model Administrative Rules
 promulgated by the International Association of Commercial
 [Corporation] Administrators, or any successor organization, and
 the reasons for these variations.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (b), Section 261.009, Business &
 Commerce Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The amount of the fee for a certificate under this
 section is[:
 [(1) $10, if] the same as the amount of the fee
 provided by Section 9.525(d) [request for the certificate is in the
 standard form prescribed by the secretary of state; or
 [(2) $25, if the request is not in the standard form].
 SECTION 5. Subsection (b), Section 261.010, Business &
 Commerce Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The fee for a copy under this section is in the amount
 provided by Section 405.031, Government Code [$1.50 per page, but
 may not be less than $5 or more than $100 for each request
 concerning a particular utility].
 SECTION 6. Subsection (b), Section 128.031, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The amount of the fee for a certificate under Subsection
 (a) is the same as the amount of the fee provided by Section
 9.525(d), Business & Commerce Code [shall be established by the
 secretary of state in an amount necessary to cover the cost of
 administering this section].
 SECTION 7. Subsection (b), Section 128.032, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The fee for a copy of a notice of claim of lien obtained
 under Subsection (a) is in the amount provided by Section 405.031,
 Government Code [shall be established by the secretary of state in
 an amount necessary to cover the cost of administering this
 section].
 SECTION 8. Subsection (b), Section 188.031, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The amount of the fee for a certificate under Subsection
 (a) is the same as the amount of the fee provided by Section
 9.525(d), Business & Commerce Code [shall be established by the
 secretary of state in an amount necessary to cover the cost of
 administering this section].
 SECTION 9. Subsection (b), Section 188.032, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The fee for a copy of a notice of claim of lien obtained
 under Subsection (a) is in the amount provided by Section 405.031,
 Government Code [shall be established by the secretary of state in
 an amount necessary to cover the cost of administering this
 section].
 SECTION 10. Section 14.004, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (d) Upon request of any person, the filing officer shall
 issue his certificate showing whether there is on file, on a [the]
 date and time specified by the filing office, but not a date earlier
 than three business days before the date the filing office receives
 the request [hour stated therein], any notice of lien or
 certificate or notice affecting any lien filed under this chapter
 or filed under the Uniform Federal Tax Lien Registration Act
 (Subchapter C, Chapter 113, Tax Code) on or after January 1, 1972,
 naming a particular person, and if a notice or certificate is on
 file, giving the date and hour of filing of each notice or
 certificate. The amount of the fee for a certificate is the same as
 the amount of the fee provided by Section 9.525(d), Business &
 Commerce Code [$10]. Upon request, the filing officer shall
 furnish a copy of any notice of federal lien. The fee for a copy
 furnished under this section is in the amount provided by Section
 405.031, Government Code[, or notice or certificate affecting a
 federal lien, for a fee of $1.50 per page].
 (e)  Section 9.523, Business & Commerce Code, applies to a
 federal lien filed under this chapter.
 SECTION 11. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1699 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1699 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor