Senate | 06/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 5039 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 197 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 197 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 58 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |