House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3411
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1935
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|