House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |