Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1735 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1735


 AN ACT
 relating to providing police and security services for certain
 post-secondary educational institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (c), Section 51.2125,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to a private institution of
 higher education that [has a fall head count enrollment of more than
 10,000 students and that] has under its control and jurisdiction
 property that is contiguous to, or located in any part within the
 boundaries of, a home-rule municipality that has [with] a
 population of 1.18 million or more and is located predominantly in a
 county that has a total area of less than 1,000 square miles [than
 one million]. For purposes of this section, a private institution
 of higher education is a private or independent institution of
 higher education as defined by Section 61.003.
 (c) A mutual assistance agreement authorized by this
 section may designate the geographic area in which the campus peace
 officers are authorized to provide assistance to the peace officers
 of the municipality, except that if the agreement is entered into
 with a municipality described by Subsection (a) that elects all or
 part of the municipality's governing body from election districts
 [with a population of more than one million], the designated
 geographic area consists of each of the election districts of the
 municipality's governing body that contains any part of the campus
 of the institution and each of the election districts of the
 governing body that is contiguous to another municipality that
 contains any part of the campus of the institution.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a), (c), (d), (f), and (g), Section
 51.214, Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) In any municipality with a population of 1.18 million or
 more, the governing board of a private, nonprofit medical
 corporation, or of the parent corporation of such medical
 corporation, that provides police or security services for an
 institution of higher education or a private postsecondary
 educational institution [and other entities] located within one of
 the medical corporation's or parent corporation's [the same]
 medical complexes [complex], or that provides police or security
 services for another medical complex legally affiliated with or
 owned, leased, managed, or controlled by the [a branch of that]
 medical corporation or parent corporation, may employ and
 commission police or security personnel to enforce the law of this
 state within the jurisdiction designated by Subsection (c).
 (c) The jurisdiction of an officer commissioned under this
 section is limited to:
 (1) property under the control and jurisdiction of the
 private, nonprofit medical corporation or its parent corporation or
 any entity legally affiliated with or owned, leased, managed, or
 controlled by the medical corporation or its parent corporation;
 [and]
 (2) a street or alley that abuts the property or an
 easement in or a right-of-way over or through the property
 described by Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  any other location in which the officer is
 performing duties assigned to the officer by the private, nonprofit
 medical corporation or its parent corporation, regardless of
 whether the officer is on property under the control and
 jurisdiction of the medical corporation or its parent corporation,
 provided that the assigned duties are consistent with the mission
 of the medical corporation or its parent corporation and are being
 performed within a county in which the medical corporation or its
 parent corporation owns real property.
 (d) An officer commissioned [by a medical corporation]
 under this section is not entitled to compensation or benefits
 provided by this state or a political subdivision of this state.
 (f) A [medical corporation may not commission a] person may
 not be commissioned under this section unless the person obtains a
 peace officer license issued by the Commission on Law Enforcement
 Officer Standards and Education. The employing medical corporation
 or parent corporation shall pay to the Commission on Law
 Enforcement Officer Standards and Education on behalf of an
 employee any fees that are necessary to obtain a required license.
 (g) A person's commission and any authority to act as an
 officer under this section are automatically revoked if the
 person's employment [with a medical corporation] is terminated for
 any reason.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1735 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1735 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor